SPRINGER v. KILHEFNER et al
Plaintiff: MARK SPRINGER
Defendant: KLOVER METRO DC, INC., KLOVER PREFABRICATION PA, INC., GERALD KILHEFNER, KLOVER CONTRACTING, INC., SKILLED TRADES HIRING INC. and KLOVER SEPA, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00552
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. 4) IS DENIED ASMOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/26/2019. 3/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Complaint against GERALD KILHEFNER, KLOVER CONTRACTING, INC., KLOVER METRO DC, INC., KLOVER PREFABRICATION PA, INC., KLOVER SEPA, INC. and SKILLED TRADES HIRING INC. filed by MARK SPRINGER, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(mbh, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR MARK SPRINGER THAT ATTORNEY WALTER J. TIMBY III AS COUNSEL IN PLACE OF ATTORNEY GREGORY A. LOMAX. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 02/21/2019.02/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL BUCCO on behalf of GERALD KILHEFNER, KLOVER CONTRACTING, INC., KLOVER METRO DC, INC., KLOVER PREFABRICATION PA, INC., KLOVER SEPA, INC., SKILLED TRADES HIRING INC. (BUCCO, PAUL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by GERALD KILHEFNER, KLOVER CONTRACTING, INC., KLOVER METRO DC, INC., KLOVER PREFABRICATION PA, INC., KLOVER SEPA, INC., SKILLED TRADES HIRING INC..Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fules 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1).(FLANDREAU, NATHANIEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Consent Order to Substitute Attorney Gregory Lomax filed by MARK SPRINGER..(TIMBY, WALTER) Modified on 2/21/2019 (md).
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHANIEL J. FLANDREAU on behalf of GERALD KILHEFNER, KLOVER CONTRACTING, INC., KLOVER METRO DC, INC., KLOVER PREFABRICATION PA, INC., KLOVER SEPA, INC., SKILLED TRADES HIRING INC. (FLANDREAU, NATHANIEL)
February 7, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MARK SPRINGER. (jaa, )
February 7, 2019 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 2/8/19 (jaa, ) Modified on 2/8/2019 (jaa, ).
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GERALD KILHEFNER, KLOVER CONTRACTING, INC., KLOVER METRO DC, INC., KLOVER PREFABRICATION PA, INC., KLOVER SEPA, INC., SKILLED TRADES HIRING INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE192152.), filed by MARK SPRINGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPRINGER v. KILHEFNER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLOVER METRO DC, INC.
Represented By: NATHANIEL J. FLANDREAU
Represented By: PAUL BUCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLOVER PREFABRICATION PA, INC.
Represented By: NATHANIEL J. FLANDREAU
Represented By: PAUL BUCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD KILHEFNER
Represented By: NATHANIEL J. FLANDREAU
Represented By: PAUL BUCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLOVER CONTRACTING, INC.
Represented By: NATHANIEL J. FLANDREAU
Represented By: PAUL BUCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKILLED TRADES HIRING INC.
Represented By: NATHANIEL J. FLANDREAU
Represented By: PAUL BUCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLOVER SEPA, INC.
Represented By: NATHANIEL J. FLANDREAU
Represented By: PAUL BUCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK SPRINGER
Represented By: GREGORY A. LOMAX
Represented By: WALTER J. TIMBY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?