JACOBS et al v. EICHELBERGER
Plaintiff: PAUL D. JACOBS and RITA JACOBS
Defendant: DANIELLE EICHELBERGER and RUBY TUESDAY, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00591
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 2 ALIAS Summons Issued as to RUBY TUESDAY, INC.. Forwarded To: ANDREW NEUWIRTH on 3/29/19 (jl, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 Praecipe for Alias Summons as to Defendant Ruby Tuesday, Inc. by PAUL D. JACOBS, RITA JACOBS. (NEUWIRTH, ANDREW) Modified on 4/1/2019 (md).
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW NEUWIRTH on behalf of PAUL D. JACOBS, RITA JACOBS, with Certificate of Service(NEUWIRTH, ANDREW) Modified on 3/29/2019 (md).
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal of allegations of recklessness, wanton conduct and claims for punitive damages by DANIELLE EICHELBERGER. (WALLACE, DIVYA)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PAUL D. JACOBS. DANIELLE EICHELBERGER waiver sent on 3/20/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (NEUWIRTH, ANDREW)
March 20, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to RUBY TUESDAY, INC forwarded to Plaintiffs' Counsel on 3/20/19. (rf, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DANIELLE EICHELBERGER, RUBY TUESDAY, INC., filed by PAUL D. JACOBS, RITA JACOBS., JURY TRIAL DEMAND, VERIFICATION.(rf, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DIVYA WALLACE on behalf of DANIELLE EICHELBERGER (WALLACE, DIVYA)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to DANIELLE EICHELBERGER on 2/11/19 by PAUL D. JACOBS, RITA JACOBS. Waiver of Service due by 3/13/2019. (fdc)
February 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PAUL D. JACOBS, RITA JACOBS. (fdc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DANIELLE EICHELBERGER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 192295.), filed by PAUL D. JACOBS, RITA JACOBS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACOBS et al v. EICHELBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL D. JACOBS
Represented By: ANDREW NEUWIRTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITA JACOBS
Represented By: ANDREW NEUWIRTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIELLE EICHELBERGER
Represented By: DIVYA WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUBY TUESDAY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?