WEST EASTON TWO, LP v. BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WEST EASTON et al

Plaintiff: WEST EASTON TWO, LP
Defendant: BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WEST EASTON and BOROUGH OF WEST EASTON
Case Number: 5:2019cv00801
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE ALL FACT DISCOVERY BY AUGUST 23, 2019, ETC. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS BY DECEMBER 2, 2019. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE OPPOSITION TO ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS BY DECEMBER 16, 2019. THE PARTIES SHALL EACH FILE A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM BY JANUARY 15, 2020. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE ANY MOTIONS IN LIMINE BY JANUARY 15, 2020, ETC. THE PARTIES SHALL AGREE UPON AND SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED POINTS FOR CHARGE AND A JOINT PROPOSED VERDICT SLIP BY JANUARY 22, 2020, ETC. THE COURT WILL HOLD A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 29, 2020, AT 10:00 A.M., AT THE HOLMES BUILDING, 101 LARRY HOLMES DRIVE, 4TH FLOOR, EASTON, PENNSYLVANIA. THE SELECTION OF A JURY SHALL TAKE PLACE ON FRIDAY, JANUARY 31, 2020, AT 9:30 A.M. JURY SELECTION WILL TAKE PLACE AT THE JAMES A. BYRNE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA, IN A COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED. A JURY TRIAL SHALL COMMENCE BEFORE THIS COURT ON MONDAY, FEBRUARY 3, 2020, AT 9:00 A.M. AT THE HOLMES BUILDING, 101 LARRY HOLMES DRIVE, 4TH FLOOR, EASTON, PENNSYLVANIA. THIS ORDER SHALL SERVE AS A FORMAL ATTACHMENT FOR TRIAL. THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON AUGUST 26, 2019, AT 9:30 A.M., BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HEFFLEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 4/25/19. 4/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/25/19. Court Reporter: None. (er, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing:Please be advised that an initial pretrial conference has been scheduled before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned case. The conference will be held at the Holmes Building, 101 Larry Holmes Drive, 4th Floor, Easton, Pennsylvania 18042 on Thursday, April 25, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. (sres, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WEST EASTON, BOROUGH OF WEST EASTON.(GOUDSOUZIAN, STEVEN)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WEST EASTON TWO, LP. BOROUGH OF WEST EASTON waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (HARRISON, JOHN)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WEST EASTON TWO, LP. BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WEST EASTON waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (HARRISON, JOHN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES F. PRESTON on behalf of WEST EASTON TWO, LP (PRESTON, JAMES)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WEST EASTON TWO, LP.(HARRISON, JOHN)
February 25, 2019 2 Original Summons Issued as to BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WEST EASTON, BOROUGH OF WEST EASTON. Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/25/2019. (DT) (DT)
February 25, 2019 Jury Trial Demanded by Plaintiff WEST EASTON TWO, LP. (DT)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WEST EASTON, BOROUGH OF WEST EASTON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APE005016.), filed by WEST EASTON TWO, LP, Jury Trial Demanded. (DT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEST EASTON TWO, LP v. BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WEST EASTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WEST EASTON
Represented By: STEVEN GOUDSOUZIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF WEST EASTON
Represented By: STEVEN GOUDSOUZIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST EASTON TWO, LP
Represented By: JOHN S. HARRISON
Represented By: JAMES F. PRESTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?