ZACK v. MATOS
Plaintiff: CHERYL LEE ZACK
Defendant: FRANCIS MATOS
Case Number: 5:2019cv01834
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHERYL LEE ZACK, filed by CHERYL LEE ZACK. No Envelope, hand delivered. (mas, ) Modified on 7/2/2019 (mas, ).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF 5/24/2019 THAT ZACK'S MOTIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ARE GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IN CIV. A. NO. 19-1808 IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITH LEAVE TO AMEND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR WANT OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. THE COMPLAINT IN CIV. A. NO. 19-1825 IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITH LEAVE TO AMEND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR WANT OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. THE COMPLAINT IN CIV. A. NO. 19-1834 IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITH LEAVE TO AMEND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR WANT OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. ZACK IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTS IN EACH CASE WITHIN THIRTY (30) IF SHE CAN CURE THE DEFECTS IDENTIFIED BY THE COURT. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDMENT, THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED. IF ZACK FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HER CASES MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 5/24/2019. 5/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF CHERYL LEE ZACK. (DT)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION OF 5/24/2019 AS TO CHARYL LEE ZACK. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/24/2019. 5/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF CHERYL LEE ZACK.(DT)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF CHERYL LEE ZACK TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. (DT) (IN PERSON FILING NO ENVELOPE) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/24/2019) (ke, ).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT ZACKS #1 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUFFICIENT FINANCIAL INFORMATION TO ALLOW THE COURT TO DETERMINE WHETHER SHE HAS THE MEANS TO PAY THE FILING FEE TO COMMENCE THIS CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND ZACK AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. IF ZACK SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SHE SHALL WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, COMPLETE THE FORM IN A MANNER THAT MAKES CLEAR TO THE COURT HOW SHE IS SUPPORTING HERSELF. IF SHE IS BEING SUPPORTED BY OTHERS, SHE MAY INDICATE THAT FACT ON HIS MOTION. ALTERNATIVELY, ZACK MAY PROCEED WITH THIS CASE BY PAYING $400 TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF ZACK FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HER CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/14/19.5/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE ALONG WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE.(mas, ) Modified on 5/20/2019 (mas, ).
April 26, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(ahf)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (mas, )
April 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHERYL LEE ZACK. (mas, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against FRANCIS MATOS, filed by CHERYL LEE ZACK. No envelope included. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mas, ) Modified on 5/10/2019 (lisad, ).
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS FILED BY CHERYL LEE ZACK. AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF THE APPLICATION. (mas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZACK v. MATOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS MATOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL LEE ZACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?