RAPPOLD v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Plaintiff: LORI A. RAPPOLD
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2019cv01964
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: RICHARD A LLORET
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by USMS Deputy Clerk re: served Summons & Complaint upon Atty. General, N. Berryhill. Soc. Sec. Comm. by Federal Express on 5/28/19 (fdc, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney, Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kw, )
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (DOC. NO. #2 ) IS GRANTED THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THE CASE ON THE EXTRANET FOR SELECTION BY A PANEL ATTORNEY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 05/08/2019.05/10/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, COPY TO PRO SE LAW CLERK.(nd, )
May 8, 2019 3 Summonses and Copies of Complaint Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded To: US MARSHAL (2) and US ATTY (1) on 5/10/19. (va, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 Procedural Order 5/10/19 Entered and copies mailed to pro se. (va, )
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 5/8/19. 5/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(va, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (er, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Magistrate Consent by LORI A. RAPPOLD. (er, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by LORI A. RAPPOLD. (IFP PENDING) (no envelope included) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(er, ) Modified on 5/8/2019 (er, ).
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES filed by LORI A. RAPPOLD. (er, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURTH WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by LORI A. RAPPOLD. (er, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAPPOLD v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI A. RAPPOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?