CARROLL v. MADARA
Plaintiff: ARTIS C. CARROLL, JR.
Defendant: JANELLE MADARA
Case Number: 5:2019cv02059
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by ARTIS C. CARROLL, JR.(ke)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by ARTIS C. CARROLL, JR(jaa, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JANELLE MADARA. JANELLE MADARA waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by TRICIA M. AMBROSE on behalf of JANELLE MADARA with Certificate of Service(AMBROSE, TRICIA)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. MACMAIN on behalf of JANELLE MADARA with Certificate of Service(MACMAIN, DAVID)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS APPOINTED TO SERVE WRITTEN WAIVER REQUESTS ON JANELLE MADERA UNDER FRCP 4(d) TO EFFECT WAIVER OF SERVICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/17/19. 5/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE FORWARDED TO PLAINTIFF ON 5/16/19 RE: WAIVERS(jpd, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to DEFENDANT on 5/16/19. Waiver of Service due by 6/17/2019. (jpd, )
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF CORUT IS SPECIALLY APPOINTED TO SERVE WRITTEN WAIVERS REQUEST ON PETER ANDERS UNDER FRCP 4(d) TO EFFECT WAIVER OF SERVICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/15/19. 5/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (jpd )
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JANELLE MADARA, filed by ARTIS C. CARROLL, JR. NO FEE. NO IFP (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Envelope)(jwl, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COPY OF MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CHARGE PRISON TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT (DOC. 9) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOC. 8) IS GRANTED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF THE LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(I) AND (ii) WE DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE MR. CARROLL'S CLAIMS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TERMINATE DEFENDANTS KAREN L. MANSFIELD, CRAIG W. STEDMAN, LANCE D. GREENE AND JOSHUA R. KELLER ON THE DOCKET BECAUSE ALL CLAIMS AGAINST THEM ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. MR. CARROLL'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT HOWARD R. BAUMAN UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1985(3) ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL OPEN A NEW CIVIL ACTION USING A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM AND A COPY OF THE COMPLAINT (DOC. 1) REFLECTING MR. CARROL AS THE SOLE PLAINTIFF AND JANELLE MADERA AS THE SOLE DEFENDANT. THIS NEW CIVIL ACTION SHALL BE ASSIGNED TO ME UNDER LRCP 40.1., ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL OPEN A SECOND NEW CIVIL ACTION USING A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM AND A COPY OF THE COMPLAINT (DOC. 1) WITH MR. CARROLL AS THE SOLE PLAINTIFF AND PETER ANDERS AS THE SOLE DEFENDANT, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TERMINATE DEFENDANTS PETER ANDERS AND JANELLE MADERA AS PARTIES IN THIS CASE., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/9/19.(jwl, ) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2019: #1 Memorandum) (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARROLL v. MADARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTIS C. CARROLL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANELLE MADARA
Represented By: TRICIA M. AMBROSE
Represented By: DAVID J. MACMAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?