MORALES v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: JOSE R. MORALES
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2019cv02239
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CAITLIN P. STRAUSS on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY NORTH AMERICA with Certificate of Service(STRAUSS, CAITLIN)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELLA N. MIDDLETON on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY NORTH AMERICA with Certificate of Service(MIDDLETON, ANGELLA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY S. KLINE on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY NORTH AMERICA with Certificate of Service(KLINE, AMY)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Life Insurance Company of North America is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Connecticut General Corporation which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Cigna Holdings, Inc., which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Cigna Holding Company which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Cigna Corporation, a publicly traded company with Certificate of Service by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY NORTH AMERICA.(KLINE, AMY)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSE R. MORALES. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY NORTH AMERICA waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (PARKER, MICHAEL) Modified on 6/17/2019 (lisad, ).
May 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY NORTH AMERICA. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/23/19 (jwl, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY NORTH AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197765.), filed by JOSE R. MORALES.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORALES v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE R. MORALES
Represented By: MICHAEL J. PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: CAITLIN P. STRAUSS
Represented By: AMY S. KLINE
Represented By: ANGELLA N. MIDDLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?