MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE

Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 5:2019cv02246
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF 6/13/2019 THAT PLAINTIFF MAY SERVE THE ISP WITH A RULE 45 SUBPOENA COMMANDING THE ISP TO PROVIDE PLAINTIFF WITH THE TRUE NAME AND ADDRESS OF THE DEFENDANT TO WHOM THE ISP ASSIGNED AN IP ADDRESS AS SET FORTH ON EXHIBIT A TO THE COMPLAINT. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/13/19. 6/13/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum re #5 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER OF 5/24/2019. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/24/19. 5/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
May 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (ahf)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. (ahf)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(ahf)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197791.), filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. FIORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?