DELONG v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: JOAN ANNE DELONG
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2019cv02392
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Referring Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS TO HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/18/19. 6/19/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by JOAN ANNE DELONG.. (THOMAS, CARLA)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (va, )
June 5, 2019 3 Summonses and Copies of Complaint Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: USM (2) and USA (1) on 6/6/19 (va, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Procedural Order 6/6/19 Entered and copies e-mailed. (va, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 6/4/19.6/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) Modified on 6/12/2019 (md).
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(er, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/10/2019) (er, ).
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by JOAN ANNE DELONG (IFP PENDING). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(er, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by JOAN ANNE DELONG. AFFIDAVIT. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(er, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELONG v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN ANNE DELONG
Represented By: CARLA J. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?