DEIHL v. CARUSO TRUCKING LTD.
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DEIHL
Defendant: CARUSO TRUCKING LTD.
Case Number: 5:2019cv02528
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE WITHIN MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO SCHEDULE AND CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON OR AFTER NOVEMBER 4, 2019. IN THE EVENT ANY DEFENDANT HAS NOT YET ENTERED AN APPEARANCE AT THE TIME OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER UPON THAT DEFENDANT. AS A MATTER OF STANDARD OPERATING PROCEDURE, THE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL CONTACT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES IN THE NEAR FUTURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/7/19. 8/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/29/2020 04:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.; DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/4/2019; MOTIONS DUE BY 11/18/2019; TRIAL DATE SET FOR 2/3/2020 09:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/8/19. 8/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR Pretrial Conference held on 08/6/19. (dt, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by CARUSO TRUCKING LTD.. (SCIDURLO, LISA)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: THE INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, AUGUST 15, 2019, AT 3:30 P.M., HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO TUESDAY, AUGUST 6, 2019, AT 4:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN U.S. COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA.(dja, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN E. LIEBHABER on behalf of JOSEPH DEIHL with jury demand(LIEBHABER, KATHRYN)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, AUGUST 15, 2019, AT 3:30 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN U.S. COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA.(dja, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CARUSO TRUCKING LTD..(SCIDURLO, LISA)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by CARUSO TRUCKING LTD..(SCIDURLO, LISA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Brittian Daudelin re: served Complaint, Summons upon Gregory R. Wilson, Esq. by Authorized Person on 06/19/2019 (KOLMAN, TIMOTHY)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER OF 6/12/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/12/2019. 6/13/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
June 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOSEPH DEIHL. (ahf)
June 11, 2019 Summons Issued as to CARUSO TRUCKING LTD.. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/11/2019 (ahf)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARUSO TRUCKING LTD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13597723.), filed by JOSEPH DEIHL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Summons)(KOLMAN, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEIHL v. CARUSO TRUCKING LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DEIHL
Represented By: TIMOTHY M. KOLMAN
Represented By: KATHRYN E. LIEBHABER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARUSO TRUCKING LTD.
Represented By: LISA MARIE SCIDURLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?