WARREN v. GANTMAN et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL WARREN
Defendant: MARY P. MURRAY, ALICE BECK DUBOW, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 1, DEBORAH A. KUNSELMAN, JOHN DOE 2, PAULA F. OTT, JANE DOE 3, WILLIAM H. PLATT, CAROLYN H. NICHOLS, SUSAN P. GANTMAN, ANNE E. LAZARUS, MARIA MCLAUGHLIN and JACK A. PANELLA
Case Number: 5:2019cv02581
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of USCA as to #8 Notice of Appeal filed by DANIEL WARREN THAT THE FOREGOING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. (jpd, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #8 Notice of Appeal filed by DANIEL WARREN. USCA Case Number 19-2649 (dmc, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Memorandum and/or Opinion, #7 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), by DANIEL WARREN. IFP granted Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mbh, )
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. DANIEL WARREN SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 INSTALLMENTS. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. WARREN COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/27/19. 7/1/19 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE AND FAXED TO WARDEN.(jl, ) Modified on 7/8/2019 (md).
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. DANIEL WARREN SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 INSTALLMENTS. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/27/19. 7/1/19 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE AND FAXED TO WARDEN.(jl, ) Modified on 7/8/2019 (md).
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by DANIEL WARREN. (dmc, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by DANIEL WARREN..(dmc, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF PLAINTIFF DANIEL WARREN WISHES TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST WITHIN 30 DAY OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER EITHER SUBMIT $400 OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH WARREN WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. IF WARREN FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND/OR CLOSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/17/19. 6/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER WITH FORM.(mbh, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALICE BECK DUBOW, SUSAN P. GANTMAN, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, DEBORAH A. KUNSELMAN, ANNE E. LAZARUS, MARIA MCLAUGHLIN, MARY P. MURRAY, CAROLYN H. NICHOLS, PAULA F. OTT, JACK A. PANELLA, WILLIAM H. PLATT, filed by DANIEL WARREN. NO FEE. NO IFP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARREN v. GANTMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY P. MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALICE BECK DUBOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH A. KUNSELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULA F. OTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM H. PLATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLYN H. NICHOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN P. GANTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNE E. LAZARUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA MCLAUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK A. PANELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?