BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY v. FISH LAND LLC et al
Plaintiff: BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY
Defendant: CALTEX AUSTRALIA PETROLEUM PTY LTD, AIG AUSTRALIA LTD, EVIJA RUNDALE and FISH LAND LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv02583
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 REMAILED DOC. #4 TO EVIJA RUNDALE AND NEW FORWARDING ADDRESS. (er, )
August 6, 2019 Copy of Order/Notice dated 7/11/19 (Document # DOC. 4) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to EVIJA RUNDALE for the following reason: FORWARDING TIME EXPIRED. (er, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against FISH LAND LLC, FISH LAND LLC, EVIJA RUNDALE, EVIJA RUNDALE by CALTEX AUSTRALIA PETROLEUM PTY LTD, AIG AUSTRALIA LTD.(ROSENBERG, ILAN)
July 23, 2019 2 Summons Issued as to FISH LAND LLC, EVIJA RUNDALE. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 7/24/19 (jaa, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Praecipe to Issue Alias Summonses for Defendants Fish Land LLC and Evija Rundale by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY. (BARBA, CHRISTINE)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS CALTEX AUSTRALIA PETROLEUM PTY LTD. AND AIG AUSTRALIA LTD. SHALL FILE ITS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JULY 24, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 7/11/19. 7/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY re #1 Complaint, Summons Issued on Caltex Australia Petroleum Pty Ltd. and AIG Australia Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BARBA, CHRISTINE)
June 14, 2019 4 Summons Issued as to AIG AUSTRALIA LTD, CALTEX AUSTRALIA PETROLEUM PTY LTD, FISH LAND LLC, EVIJA RUNDALE. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 6/14/2019 (sg, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY.(sg, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT against AIG AUSTRALIA LTD, CALTEX AUSTRALIA PETROLEUM PTY LTD, FISH LAND LLC, EVIJA RUNDALE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198916.), filed by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY.(sg, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/14/2019) (sg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY v. FISH LAND LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTINE BARBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALTEX AUSTRALIA PETROLEUM PTY LTD
Represented By: ILAN ROSENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG AUSTRALIA LTD
Represented By: ILAN ROSENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVIJA RUNDALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISH LAND LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?