KINDER v. MARINEZ et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY KINDER
Defendant: HECTOR MARINEZ and READING POLICE DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 5:2019cv02692
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (ECF NO. 11), IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITH LEAVE TO RENEW FOLLOWING COMPLETION OF PLAINTIFF'S CRIMINAL PROCEEDING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/22/19.7/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(er, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by ANTHONY KINDER. (er, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, ECF NO. 8, IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/15/19. 7/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED to PRO SE PETITIONER.(er, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by ANTHONY KINDER. (er, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION FOR PRISONERS TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by ANTHONY KINDER. (er, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. 4) IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF BERKS COUNTY JAIL. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT READING POLICE DEPARTMENT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(E)(2)(B) (II) AND THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURTS MEMORANDUM. ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS AGAINST THE REMAINING DEFENDANT, READING POLICE OFFICER HECTOR MARINEZ, ARE STAYED PENDING RESOLUTION OF KINDER'S RELATED CRIMINAL CASE, COMMONWEALTH V. KINDER, DOCKET NO. CP-06-CR-413-2019 (BERKS CTY. COMMON PLEAS), INCLUDING ANY AVAILABLE APPELLATE PROCEEDINGS. WITHIN THIRTY DAYS OF COMPLETION OF COMMONWEALTH V. KINDER, DOCKET NO. CP- 06-CR-413-2019 (BERKS CTY. COMMON PLEAS), INCLUDING ANY AVAILABLE APPELLATE PROCEEDINGS, KINDER SHALL NOTIFY THIS COURT THAT THE STATE CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS HAVE CONCLUDED SO THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION MAY PROCEED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/2/19. 7/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIF, WARDEN OF BERKS COUNTY .(er, ) Modified on 7/3/2019 (er, ).
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/2/19. 7/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(er, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by ANTHONY KINDER. (amas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ANTHONY KINDER.(amas)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF PLAINTIFF ANTHONY KINDER SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER (1) SUBMIT $400 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $50 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT (OR INSTITUTIONAL EQUIVALENT) SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, AND A CURRENT BALANCE, FROM ANY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY IN WHICH HE WAS CONFINED FOR THE SIX-MONTH PERIOD FROM DECEMBER 20, 2018 TO JUNE 20, 2019, REFLECTING ACCOUNT ACTIVITY FROM THAT TIME PERIOD. IF KINDER IS ULTIMATELY GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE WILL BE OBLIGATED TO PAY THE $350 FILING FEE IN INSTALLMENTS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(B), EVEN IF HIS CASE IS DISMISSED. HE WILL NOT BE ENTITLED TO THE RETURN OF ANY PAYMENTS MADE TOWARD THE FEE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH KINDER WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. IF KINDER FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND/OR CLOSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/21/19. 6/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF WITH CURRENT IFP APPLICATION. (er, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HECTOR MARINEZ, READING POLICE DEPARTMENT (NO FEE, NO IFP), filed by ANTHONY KINDER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets, #2 Envelope)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KINDER v. MARINEZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HECTOR MARINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: READING POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY KINDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?