BOYER v. METROPOLITAN MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: ARIELLE BOYER
Defendant: METROPOLITAN MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv02798
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN E. SUMMERS on behalf of METROPOLITAN MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(SUMMERS, SEAN)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JILL E. NAGY on behalf of METROPOLITAN MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(NAGY, JILL)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ARIELLE BOYER. METROPOLITAN MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (CHASE, JONATHAN)
June 26, 2019 (1) Summons Issued as to METROPOLITAN MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.. Forwarded To: counsel on 6/27/19. (kw, )
June 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PLFF ARIELLE BOYER. (kw, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against METROPOLITAN MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE199482.), filed by ARIELLE BOYER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOYER v. METROPOLITAN MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARIELLE BOYER
Represented By: JONATHAN W. CHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.
Represented By: SEAN E. SUMMERS
Represented By: JILL E. NAGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?