GILBERT v. DIPLOMAT PROPERTY MGR LLC et al
Plaintiff: BRUCE A. GILBERT
Defendant: DIPLOMAT PROPERTY MGR LLC, BANK OF AMERICA, FAY SERVICING and MCCABE, WEISBERG & CONWAY LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv02986
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Referring Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 12:1421
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DIPLOMAT PROPERTY MGR LLC, FAY SERVICING.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LINK, JOSHUA)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA M. LINK on behalf of DIPLOMAT PROPERTY MGR LLC, FAY SERVICING with Certificate of Service(LINK, JOSHUA)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Status Report on Request for USM 285 Form (mbh, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY THE SHERIFF'S SALE OF PROPERTY LOCATED AT 6 WILDEN DRIVE, EASTON, PA 18045 IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO BE FILED IN THE NORTHAMPTON COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS UNDER DOCKET NUMBER C-48-CV-2014-3288.SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/30/19. 8/1/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, )
July 31, 2019 (4) Summons Issued as to BANK OF AMERICA, DIPLOMAT PROPERTY MGR LLC, FAY SERVICING and MCCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY LLC. Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal Service on 7/31/19 (mbh, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE US MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT UPON THE DEFENDANTS AT NO COST TO GILBERT. GILBERT WILL BE REQUIRED TO COMPLETE USM-285 FORMS SO THAT THE MARSHALS CAN SERVE DEFENDANTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/26/19. 7/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF BRUCE A. GILBERT TO HAVE AN EMERGENCY HEARING OR TO STAY OR POSTPONE SHERIFF'S SALE. (DT)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/23/19. 7/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (DT)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BANK OF AMERICA, DIPLOMAT PROPERTY MGR LLC, FAY SERVICING, MCCABE, WEISBERG & CONWAY LLC, filed by PRO SE PLAINTIFF BRUCE A. GILBERT.(DT)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF BRUCE A. GILBERT TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. (DT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILBERT v. DIPLOMAT PROPERTY MGR LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE A. GILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIPLOMAT PROPERTY MGR LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA M. LINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAY SERVICING
Represented By: JOSHUA M. LINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCABE, WEISBERG & CONWAY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?