PUERTO v. SAUL
Plaintiff: GUSTAVO PUERTO
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2019cv03109
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH T HEY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 US Marshal Return Re: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED UPON ATTY. GENERAL VIA FEDEX ON 8/19/2019. (sg, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 US Marshal Return Re: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED UPON NANCY BERRYHILL VIA FEDEX ON 8/20/2019. (sg, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Social Security Magistrate Consent by GUSTAVO PUERTO.. (PANDALEON, ROBERT)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by GUSTAVO PUERTO.. (PANDALEON, ROBERT) Modified on 8/19/2019 (afm, ). (FILED IN ERROR, ATTORNEY TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (sg, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE CONSENT TO OR DECLINATION OF JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 CONSENT) 8/14/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Procedural Order 7/26/2019 Entered and copies e-mailed. (sg, )
July 23, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL. Forwarded To: 1 TO US ATTORNEY 2 US MARSHAL on 7/24/2019 (sg, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE E.D.P.A. SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE E.D.P.A.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 7/22/2019.7/24/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Declination of Jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge)(DT)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by GUSTAVO PUERTO. (IFP PENDING)(DT) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dt, ).
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 DECLARATION OF GUSTAVO PUERTO IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (DT) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUERTO v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUSTAVO PUERTO
Represented By: ROBERT R. PANDALEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?