TURCZYNSKI v. LIFT, INC.
Plaintiff: NATHAN TURCZYNSKI
Defendant: LIFT, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv03158
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by NATHAN TURCZYNSKI. Amended Complaint. (MOBILIO, MATTHEW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LIFT, INC..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum Of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHIRE, BRIAN)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. SHIRE on behalf of LIFT, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHIRE, BRIAN)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by LIFT, INC..(SHIRE, BRIAN)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NATHAN TURCZYNSKI. LIFT, INC. waiver sent on 7/29/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (MOBILIO, MATTHEW) Modified on 8/7/2019 (lvj, ).
July 19, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NATHAN TURCZYNSKI. (mas, )
July 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to LIFT, INC.. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/19/19 (mas, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFT, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APE005182.), filed by NATHAN TURCZYNSKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TURCZYNSKI v. LIFT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFT, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN P. SHIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN TURCZYNSKI
Represented By: MATTHEW MOBILIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?