BELGE et al v. CLAGGETT et al
Plaintiff: BRENDEN BELGE and ALISSA BELGE
3Rd Party Plaintiff: SHANNON L. CLAGGETT and TIMOTHY A. CLAGGETT
3Rd Party Defendant: THOMAS J DILULLO, BETTY C DILULLO and TBR&L, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv03171
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/3/19 IS CANCELED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/5/19. 9/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) Modified on 9/5/2019 (rf, ).
August 30, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to BETTY C DILULLO, THOMAS J DILULLO, TBR&L, LLC. forwarded to Defendants/Third Party Plaintiffs' Counsel on 8/30/19. (rf, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against TBR&L, LLC, THOMAS J DILULLO, BETTY C DILULLO, filed by SHANNON L. CLAGGETT, TIMOTHY A. CLAGGETT, JURY TRIAL DEMAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(rf, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES ARE TO APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/3/2019 AT 2:00 PM IN ROOM 3809 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 08/27/19. 08/27/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, together with Affirmative Defenses, by SHANNON L. CLAGGETT, TIMOTHY A. CLAGGETT, Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(GELSINGER, THAD) Modified on 8/28/2019 (md).
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Paul S. Chesney re: served Summons & Complaint upon Timothy and Shannon Claggett by Personal Service on August 5, 2019 (TUPITZA, JAMES)
July 19, 2019 2 Summons Issued as to SHANNON L. CLAGGETT, TIMOTHY A. CLAGGETT. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/22/2019 (amas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. TUPITZA on behalf of ALISSA BELGE, BRENDEN BELGE (amas)
July 19, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALISSA BELGE, BRENDEN BELGE. (amas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHANNON L. CLAGGETT, TIMOTHY A. CLAGGETT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200709.), filed by BRENDEN BELGE, ALISSA BELGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELGE et al v. CLAGGETT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: SHANNON L. CLAGGETT
Represented By: THAD MELVIN GELSINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: TIMOTHY A. CLAGGETT
Represented By: THAD MELVIN GELSINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDEN BELGE
Represented By: JAMES S. TUPITZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALISSA BELGE
Represented By: JAMES S. TUPITZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: THOMAS J DILULLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BETTY C DILULLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: TBR&L, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?