LABARRE v. RUSSELL et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY PAUL LABARRE, JR.
Defendant: CLIFF KNAPPENBURGER, ROBERT MACFADDEN, JANINE DANATE and KYLE RUSSELL
Case Number: 5:2019cv03189
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/6/19. 9/9/19 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE.(jl, )
August 20, 2019 NOTICE OF GUIDELINES FOR REPRESENTING YOURSELF IN FEDERAL COURT AND MEMO/ORDER FORWARDED TO INMATE's NEW ADDRESS FROM INMATE LOCATOR. (jaa, ) Modified on 8/22/2019 (jaa, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Copy of Order/Notice dated 7/23/19 (Document NOTICE OF PRO SE GUIDELINES) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to TIMOTHY LABARRE for the following reason: RETURN TO SENDER. (jaa, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350.00 IN INSTALLMENTS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS OREDER TO THE WARDEN OF LEHIGH COUNTY JAIL. THE COMPLAINT IS FILED AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. PLAINTIFF IS GIVEN UNTIL 8/26/19 TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/26/19. 7/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES OF ORDER AND FORMS MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/26/19. 7/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (jpd ) Modified on 7/29/2019 (lisad, ).
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by TIMOTHY PAUL LABARRE, JR. (ahf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JANINE DANATE, CLIFF KNAPPENBURGER, ROBERT MACFADDEN, KYLE RUSSELL, filed by TIMOTHY PAUL LABARRE, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ahf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY TIMOTHY PAUL LABARRE, JR.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LABARRE v. RUSSELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLIFF KNAPPENBURGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT MACFADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANINE DANATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE RUSSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY PAUL LABARRE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?