NIETO et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL THOMPSON, DEBRA DOERR and BENJAMIN NIETO
Defendant: SECANT MEDICAL, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, PRODESCO, INC., SECANT MEDICAL, INC., THE SECANT GROUP, LLC and ETHICON, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv03659
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. Motion Hearing held on 10/01/2019 re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by DEBRA DOERR, BENJAMIN NIETO, #9 MOTION to Remand filed by DEBRA DOERR, BENJAMIN NIETO, MICHAEL THOMPSON. Court Reporter: ESR. (DT)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF 9/26/2019 THAT THE APPLICATION OF ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF BRADLEY L. LEGER, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND MR. LEGER IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE WITHOUT RESTRICTION, FOR THE PURPOSE OF APPEARING AND REPRESENTING THE PLAINTIFFS IN THIS LITIGATION. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/26/2019. 9/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED TO BRADLEY L. LEGER, ESQUIRE).(DT)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF 9/26/2019 THAT THE APPLICATION OF ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF KASSI P. MARKS, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND MS. MARKS IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE WITHOUT RESTRICTION, FOR THEPURPOSE OF APPEARING AND REPRESENTING THE PLAINTIFFS IN THIS LITIGATION. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/26/2019. 9/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED TO KASSI P. MARKS, ESQUIRE.(DT)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF 9/26/2019 THAT THE APPLICATION OF ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF RODNEY K. CASTILLE, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND MR. CASILLE IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE WITHOUT RESTRICTION, FOR THE PURPOSE OF APPEARING AND REPRESENTING THE PLAINTIFFS IN THIS LITIGATION. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/26/2019. 9/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED TO RODNEY K. CASTILLE, ESQUIRE.(DT) Modified on 9/26/2019 (dt, ).
September 23, 2019 Filing 25 Copy of Order/Notice dated 09/13/2019 (Document # 18) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Prodesco, Inc. for the following reason: Not Deliverable as Addressed. (DT)
September 23, 2019 Filing 24 Copy of Order/Notice dated 09/03/2019 (Document # 15) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Prodesco, Inc. for the following reason: Undeliverable as Addressed. (DT)
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 (FEE RECEIVED 9/25/2019) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by DEBRA DOERR, BENJAMIN NIETO..(SHERRY, DANIEL) Modified on 9/26/2019 (amas). (Filing fee paid on 9/25/19) Modified on 9/27/2019 (kw, ).
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 (FEE RECEIVED 9/25/2019) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by DEBRA DOERR, BENJAMIN NIETO..(SHERRY, DANIEL) Modified on 9/26/2019 (amas). (Filing fee paid on 9/25/19) Modified on 9/27/2019 (kw, ).
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 (FEE RECEIVED 9/25/2019) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by DEBRA DOERR, BENJAMIN NIETO..(SHERRY, DANIEL) Modified on 9/26/2019 (amas). (Filing fee paid on 9/25/19) Modified on 9/27/2019 (kw, ).
September 17, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by DEBRA DOERR, BENJAMIN NIETO. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(SHERRY, DANIEL) Modified on 9/18/2019 (lisad, ).
September 17, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by DEBRA DOERR, BENJAMIN NIETO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; SEE PAPER #20 FOR CORRECT FILING). (SHERRY, DANIEL) Modified on 9/17/2019 (fb).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF 9/13/2019 THAT THE ORAL ARGUMENT IS SCHEDULED ON THE MOTION TO REMAND ONLY FOR TUESDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2019 AT 2:00PM IN THE READING COURTROOM. THE MADISON BUILDING, 4TH FLOOR, 400 WASHINGTON STREET, READING, PA; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS ARE HEREBY ALLOWED TO FILE ANY OPPOSITION MOTIONS AND BRIEFS TO THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, SEVER AND TRANSFER WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS OF THIS COURT'S RULING AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND UNLESS DETERMINED OTHERWISE BY ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/13/2019. 9/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (DT)
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - West Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Batke Supp. Decl., #3 Exhibit C - PCCP Order 12-4-17, #4 Exhibit D - PCCP Order 8-25-14)(CALLSEN, JULIE)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 Copy of Order/Notice dated 08/30/2019 (Documents # 12,13,14) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Prodesco, Inc. for the following reason: Insufficient Address. (DT)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE MOTIONS PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2019 AT 2:30 P.M. IS CHANGED TO TUESDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2019, AT 2:00 P.M., IN THE READING COURTROOM, THE MADISON BUILDING, 4TH FLOOR, 400 WASHINGTON STREET, READING, PENNSYLVANIA. (NOTE: THIS IS TIME CHANGE ONLY.). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/3/19. 9/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF 8/30/2019 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF NIETO, ET AL'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXHIBITS A-1 THROUGH A-3 UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/30/2019. 8/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (DT)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF 8/30/2019 THAT AFTER REVIEWING DEFENDANT THE SECANT GROUP, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCKET NO. 3), DEFENDANT ETHICAON, INC., AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON'S MOTION TO SEVER (DOCKET NO. 6), AND PLAITNIFF BENJAMIN NIETO AND DEBRA DOERR'S MOTIONTO REMAND (DOCKET NO. 9), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE MOTIONS SHALL BE HELD ON OCTOBER 1, 2019 AT 2:30PM IN READING COURTROOM. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 08/30/2019. 8/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES(DT)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF 8/30/2019 THAT THE PALINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTNED THE TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION MOTIONS AND BRIEFS TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, SEVER AND TRANSFER WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THIS COURT RULING ON THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND IS GRANTED. THE PLAITNIFFS ARE HEREBY ALLOWED TO FILE ANY OPPOSITION MOTIONS AND BRIEFS TO THE DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS, SEVER AND TRANSFER WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS OF THIS COURT'S RULING AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMAND UNLESS DETERMINED OTHERWISE BY ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/30/2019. 8/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED, MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES. (DT) Modified on 8/30/2019 (dt, ). Modified on 8/30/2019 (dt, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DEBRA DOERR, BENJAMIN NIETO, MICHAEL THOMPSON. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SHERRY, DANIEL) Modified on 8/29/2019 (lisad, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Seal filed by DEBRA DOERR, BENJAMIN NIETO, MICHAEL THOMPSON. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SHERRY, DANIEL) Modified on 8/29/2019 (lisad, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand filed by DEBRA DOERR, BENJAMIN NIETO, MICHAEL THOMPSON. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, #4 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SHERRY, DANIEL) Modified on 8/29/2019 (lisad, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand filed by DEBRA DOERR, BENJAMIN NIETO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, #4 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SHERRY, DANIEL) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE CORRECT DOCUMENT* Modified on 8/28/2019 (lisad, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL JOSEPH SHERRY, JR on behalf of BENJAMIN NIETO, MICHAEL THOMPSON, DEBRA DOERR. (SHERRY, DANIEL) Modified on 8/29/2019 (lisad, ).
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs and to Transfer Plaintiff Michael Thompson's Claims to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CALLSEN, JULIE)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(CALLSEN, JULIE)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by ETHICON, INC..(CALLSEN, JULIE)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by THE SECANT GROUP, LLC.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CALLSEN, JULIE)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including JOHNSON & JOHNSON with Certificate of Service by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(jwl, ) Modified on 8/15/2019 (lisad, ).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 19070243. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202078)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NIETO et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECANT MEDICAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: MOLLY ELIZABETH FLYNN
Represented By: JULIE A. CALLSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRODESCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECANT MEDICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SECANT GROUP, LLC
Represented By: JULIE A. CALLSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON, INC.
Represented By: MOLLY ELIZABETH FLYNN
Represented By: JULIE A. CALLSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL THOMPSON
Represented By: SHAWN P. ALLYN
Represented By: DANIEL JOSEPH SHERRY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA DOERR
Represented By: SHAWN P. ALLYN
Represented By: RODNEY K. CASTILLE
Represented By: BRADLEY L. LEGER
Represented By: DANIEL JOSEPH SHERRY, JR.
Represented By: KASSI P. MARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN NIETO
Represented By: SHAWN P. ALLYN
Represented By: RODNEY K. CASTILLE
Represented By: BRADLEY L. LEGER
Represented By: DANIEL JOSEPH SHERRY, JR.
Represented By: KASSI P. MARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?