STELMA v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Plaintiff: MELISSA STELMA
Defendant: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Case Number: 5:2019cv03712
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) by MELISSA STELMA. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELISSA STELMA re: James Burke served Summons and Complaint upon LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON by Personal Service. (va, ) Modified on 9/10/2019 (md).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD (DOC. NO. 2), IS GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON TO PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO OCTOBER 8, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/5/19.9/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, STEVEN)
August 16, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 8/19/19 (jaa, ) Modified on 8/19/2019 (jaa, ).
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE202266.) filed by MELISSA STELMA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STELMA v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Represented By: STEVEN SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA STELMA
Represented By: MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?