HUBLER v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE HUBLER
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON, AMANDA MCCLURE, BLAKE MCCLURE and JOHNSON & JOHNSON SAVINGS PLAN
Case Number: 5:2019cv03746
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEPHANIE HUBLER re #5 Amended Complaint on Blake McClure (MITTMAN, JEREMY)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEPHANIE HUBLER re #5 Amended Complaint on Amanda McClure (MITTMAN, JEREMY)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEPHANIE HUBLER re #5 Amended Complaint on Johnson & Johnson Savings Plan (MITTMAN, JEREMY)
October 4, 2019 3 Summons Issued on amended complaint as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON SAVINGS PLAN, AMANDA MCCLURE, BLAKE MCCLURE. Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/4/2019 (DT)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON SAVINGS PLAN, AMANDA MCCLURE, BLAKE MCCLURE, filed by STEPHANIE HUBLER.(DT) Modified on 10/4/2019 (dt, ).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 9/26/2019 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, ONLY, AND FOR NO OTHER PURPOSE, IS EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING OCTOBER 25, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 9/26/19. 9/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEPHANIE HUBLER (MITTMAN, JEREMY)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/20/2019. 8/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
August 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/20/2019 (ahf)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202349.), filed by STEPHANIE HUBLER.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUBLER v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: MONICA T. HOLLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA MCCLURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAKE MCCLURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON SAVINGS PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE HUBLER
Represented By: JEREMY Z. MITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?