MILLER v. SAUL
Plaintiff: TRACEY A. MILLER and TRACEY A. JENNINGS
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2019cv04536
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HENRY S PERKIN
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (mbh, )
October 10, 2019 3 Original Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. Forwarded To: (2) to U.S.MARSHAL on 10/10/19 1 to U.S. Attorney's Office on 10/10/2019. (dt, ) Modified on 10/11/2019 (dt, ).
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Procedural Order 10/10/19 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (dt)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF 10/10/2019 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND COMPLAINT, IT IS ORDERED THAT: LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHLAL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE U.S.MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FRCP 4(I). ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 10/10/19.10/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(mbh, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint against ANDREW SAUL filed by TRACEY A. MILLER.(mbh, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS FILED BY TRACEY A. MILLER.(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY A. MILLER
Represented By: PATRICK J. BEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY A. JENNINGS
Represented By: PATRICK J. BEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?