DEUTSCH v. THE TORO COMPANY
Plaintiff: JANE L. DEUTSCH
Defendant: THE TORO COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv05019
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE TORO COMPANY.(NEWMAN, KENNETH)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE RICHARD MURPHY on behalf of THE TORO COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MURPHY, GEORGE)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA J. HERZOG on behalf of THE TORO COMPANY with Certificate of Service(HERZOG, LAURA)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH T. NEWMAN on behalf of THE TORO COMPANY with Certificate of Service(NEWMAN, KENNETH)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JANE L. DEUTSCH. THE TORO COMPANY waiver sent on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (ALTEMOSE, MARK)
October 21, 2019 1 Original Summons Issued as to THE TORO COMPANY. Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/21/19. (DT)
October 21, 2019 Jury Trial Demanded by JANE L. DEUTSCH. (DT)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Trial Demanded against THE TORO COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APE005344.), filed by PLAINTIFF JANE L. DEUTSCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Designation Form and Case Management Track Designation Form)(DT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEUTSCH v. THE TORO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TORO COMPANY
Represented By: KENNETH T. NEWMAN
Represented By: GEORGE RICHARD MURPHY
Represented By: LAURA J. HERZOG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE L. DEUTSCH
Represented By: MARK K. ALTEMOSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?