MILBOURN v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: JANINE INEZ MILBOURN
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2019cv05191
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: DAVID R STRAWBRIDGE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Procedural Order 1/02/2020 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (bw, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Magistrate Consent by JANINE INEZ MILBOURN.. (FROELICH, JAMES)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(bw, )
November 4, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General 2 Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/6/2019 1 Summons forwarded to AUSA 11/6/2019. (bw, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206280.), filed by JANINE INEZ MILBOURN.(bw, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/14/2019) (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILBOURN v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANINE INEZ MILBOURN
Represented By: JAMES CHRISTOPHER FROELICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?