HAWK v. SAUL
Plaintiff: JEFFREY HAWK
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2019cv05674
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HENRY S PERKIN
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR, RE-FILED IN CORRECT CASE 19-5684) US Marshal Return Re: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED UPON NANCY BERRYHILL BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 12/26/2019. (amas) Modified on 12/31/2019 (amas). (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/31/2019) (amas, ).
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 US Marshal Return Re: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED UPON NANCY BERRYHILL AND THE ATTY GENERAL BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 12/26/2019. (amas)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (nd, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Social Security Magistrate Consent by JEFFREY HAWK.. (DEXTER, JUDITH)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 Procedural Order 12/11/19 Entered and copies e-mailed. (mas, )
December 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General 2 Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal and 1 Forwarded To: U.S. Attorney on 12/10/19. (mas, )
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT #1 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(I), AT THE FOLLOWING ADDRESSES: OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL, REGION III, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, 300 SPRING GARDEN STREET, 6TH FLOOR, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19123-2932; UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, 950 PENNSYLVANIA AVENUE, NW, WASHINGTON, DC 20530-0001. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 12/10/19.12/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (mas, ). (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/5/2019) (mas, ). Modified on 12/5/2019 (mas, ).
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by JEFFREY HAWK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mas, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY JEFFREY HAWK. DECLARATION IN SUPPORT. PROPOSED ORDER. (mas, ) Modified on 12/3/2019 (mas, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAWK v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY HAWK
Represented By: JUDITH A. DEXTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?