MCNALLY v. SAUL
Plaintiff: RUTH D. MCNALLY
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2020cv00703
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JACOB P HART
Referring Judge: MARILYN HEFFLEY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 3/31/20. 3/31/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ronold J. Karasek,Esquire re: served Summons and Complaint upon Social Security Administration and Counsel by Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested on February 14, 2020 (KARASEK, RONOLD)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jaa, )
February 6, 2020 3 Original Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel & 1 Forwarded to U.S. Attorney's Office on 2/6/20 (DT)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Procedural Order 2/7/20 Entered and copies e-mailed. (DT)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Declination Magistrate Judge)(DT)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APE005468.), filed by RUTH D. MCNALLY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Designation form, #2 Case Management Track Form)(DT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCNALLY v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTH D. MCNALLY
Represented By: RONOLD J. KARASEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?