GREENE et al v. NEWREZ LLC
Plaintiff: CINDY GREENE and CHRISTOPHER GREENE
Defendant: NEWREZ LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01471
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT AGAINST DISMISSAL OF CASE, EXHIBITS by CHRISTOPHER GREENE, CINDY GREENE. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, )
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT ON OR BEFORE MAY 26, 2020, PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS, OR, WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE, THE MOTION MAY BE GRANTED AS UNCONTESTED AND/OR THE CASE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/7/20. 5/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF BY CHAMBERS, AND E-MAILED.(er, )
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT ON OR BEFORE MAY 8, 2020, PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS, OR, WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE, THE MOTION MAY BE GRANTED AS UNCONTESTED AND/OR THE CASE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/20/20. 4/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S) AND E-MAILED.(er, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION and Incorporated Brief to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NEWREZ LLC, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(ADMIRE, MEGAN) Modified on 3/24/2020 (md, ).
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NEWREZ LLC from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS NORTHAMPTON COUNTY, case number C-48-CV-2020-01651. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 213120)(kp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENE et al v. NEWREZ LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWREZ LLC
Represented By: MEGAN ADMIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?