RETIREMENT MEDIA, INC. et al v. THE RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CRASH PROOF RETIREMENT, LLC and RETIREMENT MEDIA, INC.
Defendant: PHILIP L. RICHARDSON, THE RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC, PHILIP RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC and GEORGE D. SHEETS, III
Case Number: 5:2020cv01835
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PHILIP RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC.(PAPPAS, EVAN)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against CRASH PROOF RETIREMENT, LLC, RETIREMENT MEDIA, INC. by GEORGE D. SHEETS, III, PHILIP RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC, PHILIP L. RICHARDSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(PAPPAS, EVAN)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RETIREMENT MEDIA, INC., PHILIP RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC, THE RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC, CRASH PROOF RETIREMENT, LLC. All Defendants. (LIEBESMAN, SIDNEY)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by CRASH PROOF RETIREMENT, LLC, PHILIP RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC, RETIREMENT MEDIA, INC., THE RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC re #1 Complaint (Attorney), (LIEBESMAN, SIDNEY)
April 10, 2020 Summons Issued as to PHILIP RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC, PHILIP L. RICHARDSON, GEORGE D. SHEETS, III, THE RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC. Emailed to : Counsel on 4/10/20 (er, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN NORTH MILLER on behalf of CRASH PROOF RETIREMENT, LLC, RETIREMENT MEDIA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, RYAN)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHNNA M. DARBY on behalf of CRASH PROOF RETIREMENT, LLC, RETIREMENT MEDIA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DARBY, JOHNNA)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/9/20. 4/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
April 8, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CRASH PROOF RETIREMENT, LLC, RETIREMENT MEDIA, INC.. (tjd)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14226303.), filed by RETIREMENT MEDIA, INC., CRASH PROOF RETIREMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Verification, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Case Management Track Designation Form)(LIEBESMAN, SIDNEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RETIREMENT MEDIA, INC. et al v. THE RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP L. RICHARDSON
Represented By: EVAN PAPPAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP RICHARDSON GROUP, LLC
Represented By: EVAN PAPPAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE D. SHEETS, III
Represented By: EVAN PAPPAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRASH PROOF RETIREMENT, LLC
Represented By: SIDNEY S. LIEBESMAN
Represented By: JOHNNA M. DARBY
Represented By: RYAN NORTH MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RETIREMENT MEDIA, INC.
Represented By: SIDNEY S. LIEBESMAN
Represented By: JOHNNA M. DARBY
Represented By: RYAN NORTH MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?