MODLOGIQ, INC. v. THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA
Plaintiff: MODLOGIQ, INC. and NRB (USA), INC.
Defendant: THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA
Case Number: 5:2020cv02678
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, AUGUST 20, 2020, AT 2:30 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. COUNSEL WILL BE PROVIDED WITH CALL-IN INFORMATION BY EMAIL.(dja, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MODLOGIQ, INC. re #2 Order (CAMAROTA, FRANCIS)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Francis A. Camarota re: served Summons and Complaint upon Jeffrey Jubera, Registered Agent for The Guarantee Company of North America USA by Certified Mail Return Receipt Requested on June 17, 2020 (CAMAROTA, FRANCIS)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Disclosure Rule 7.1)(BLEACHER, MATTHEW)
June 10, 2020 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MODLOGIQ, INC.. (SEE #3 FOR ATTACHMENT)(lvj, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by MODLOGIQ, INC. of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure (CAMAROTA, FRANCIS)
June 9, 2020 Summons Issued as to THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/9/20 (JL )
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/9/20. 6/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14338960.), filed by MODLOGIQ, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A-F)(CAMAROTA, FRANCIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MODLOGIQ, INC. v. THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA
Represented By: MATTHEW S. BLEACHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MODLOGIQ, INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS A. CAMAROTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NRB (USA), INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS A. CAMAROTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?