SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY v. SIEMENS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY, A/S/O HYDROJET SERVICES INC. and SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY
Defendant: FLOW INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MEISTER COX ARCHITECTS, P.C., FICTITIOUS DEFENDANT JOHN D A, FICTITIOUS DEFENDANT JOHN DOE B, AND/OR FICTITIOUS DEFENDANT JOHN DOE C, BOGIA ENGINEERING, INC., SIEMENS CORPORATION, ALTA ENTERPRISES, INC., CC&M SERVICES INC., FICTITIOUS DEFENDANT JOHN DOE C, FICTITIOUS DEFENDANT JOHN DOE B, LYNCH 2, INC., FICTITIOUS DEFENDANT JOHN D A and CURRENT CONNECTIONS AND MECHANICAL SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 5:2020cv03427
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Hinkle, S.R.U. Services, LLC re: served Affidavit of Service upon Lynch 2, Inc. by Business on August 19, 2020, 6:30 pm EDT (ARTMAN, JENNIFER)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY. FLOW INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (ARTMAN, JENNIFER)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 Waiver of the Service of Summons by SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY (ARTMAN, JENNIFER) Modified on 8/14/2020 (fb).
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA FECILE-MORELAND on behalf of BOGIA ENGINEERING, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FECILE-MORELAND, PATRICIA)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by RICHARD D. GABLE, JR on behalf of SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY(GABLE, RICHARD)
August 7, 2020 Summons Issued as to ALTA ENTERPRISES, INC., BOGIA ENGINEERING, INC., CURRENT CONNECTIONS AND MECHANICAL SERVICES, INC., FLOW INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, LYNCH 2, INC., MEISTER COX ARCHITECTS, P.C., SIEMENS CORPORATION. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/7/20 (jaa, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 Praecipe to Issue Summons by SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY. (ARTMAN, JENNIFER)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Sentry Mutual Holding Company with Certificate of Service by SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(ARTMAN, JENNIFER)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF 7/28/20 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION SEEKING LEAVE TO FILE IT'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: THE MOTION SEEKING LEAVE TO FILE ITS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ECF NO 5, IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO DOCKET PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, WHICH IS ATTACHED TO THE MOTION AT ECF NO. 5-3, IN A SEPARATE DOCKET ENTRY. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 7/28/20. 7/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALTA ENTERPRISES, INC., BOGIA ENGINEERING, INC., FLOW INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MEISTER COX ARCHITECTS, P.C., SIEMENS CORPORATION, CURRENT CONNECTIONS AND MECANICAL SERVICES, INC., LYNCH 2, INC., filed by SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY.(dt, ) (dt, ). Modified on 7/28/2020 (dt, ). Modified on 7/28/2020 (dt, ). Modified on 7/28/2020 (dt, ).
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(GABLE, RICHARD)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DENISE M. MANDI on behalf of CC&M SERVICES INC. (MANDI, DENISE)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER OF 7/14/20. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/14/20. 7/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
July 13, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY. (fb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Siemens USA Holdings, Inc., Siemens Beteiligungen USA GmbH, Siemens Beteiligungen Inland GmbH, Siemens AG with Certificate of Service by SIEMENS CORPORATION.(DENNISON, KRISTEN)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SIEMENS CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14417752), filed by SIEMENS CORPORATION.(DENNISON, KRISTEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY v. SIEMENS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOW INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEISTER COX ARCHITECTS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FICTITIOUS DEFENDANT JOHN D A, FICTITIOUS DEFENDANT JOHN DOE B, AND/OR FICTITIOUS DEFENDANT JOHN DOE C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOGIA ENGINEERING, INC.
Represented By: PATRICIA FECILE-MORELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIEMENS CORPORATION
Represented By: KRISTEN E. DENNISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTA ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CC&M SERVICES INC.
Represented By: DENISE M. MANDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FICTITIOUS DEFENDANT JOHN DOE C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FICTITIOUS DEFENDANT JOHN DOE B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNCH 2, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FICTITIOUS DEFENDANT JOHN D A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURRENT CONNECTIONS AND MECHANICAL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY, A/S/O HYDROJET SERVICES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENTRY INSURANCE A MUTUAL COMPANY
Represented By: JENNIFER A. ARTMAN
Represented By: RICHARD D. GABLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?