BINGHAM v. CITY OF READING, PA et al
Petitioner: TRENTAIR BINGHAM
Respondent: JASMINE SANCHEZ and CITY OF READING, PA
Case Number: 5:2020cv03516
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 PLEADING #3 RETURNED AS TO TRENTAIR BINGHAM (JL )
July 27, 2020 Document #4 mailed to pro se litigant with Form. (nd, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF MUST WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER PAY THE $400.00 FILING FEWE TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT FOR THE SIX(6) MONTH PERIOD FORM 1/16/20 THROUGH 7/16/20. THE CLERK SHALL FURNISH PLAINTIFF WITH A BLANK COPY OPF THIS COURT'S CURRENT IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION BEARING THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO CP\OMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/24/20. 7/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES OF ORDER AND FORMS NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(jpd, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Letter dated 7/16/20 by TRENTAIR BINGHAM (fdc, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF READING, PA, JASMINE SANCHEZ, filed by TRENTAIR BINGHAM. (NO IFP, NE FEE PAID) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form)(fdc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BINGHAM v. CITY OF READING, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JASMINE SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CITY OF READING, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRENTAIR BINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?