Van Leusden et al v. STATE FARM INSURANCE CO.
Plaintiff: Job H Van Leusden and TAMMY MARTIN
Defendant: STATE FARM INSURANCE CO. and STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2020cv03661
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by STATE FARM INSURANCE CO..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(DESIPIO, YOLANDA)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO BE CONDUCTED VIA TELEPHONE. Please be advised that an initial pretrial conference to be conducted via telephone before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned case has been scheduled for MONDAY, AUGUST 24, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for all the parties will use dial in number 1-571-353-2300 and use pin 363 973 916# to enter the conference call.(sres, )
July 28, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM INSURANCE CO.. (fb)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(DESIPIO, YOLANDA)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE INSURANCE CO. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14453938), filed by STATE FARM FIRE INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit, #5 Certificate of Service)(DESIPIO, YOLANDA) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/3/2020) (fb). Modified on 8/3/2020 (fb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Leusden et al v. STATE FARM INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: YOLANDA KONOPACKA DESIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: YOLANDA KONOPACKA DESIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Job H Van Leusden
Represented By: JAMES R. ROSATO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY MARTIN
Represented By: JAMES R. ROSATO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?