Skull Shaver, LLC v. Freedom Grooming
Plaintiff: Skull Shaver, LLC
Defendant: Freedom Grooming
Case Number: 5:2020cv03670
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Skull Shaver, LLC. Freedom Grooming waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (SOLIMAN, AHMED)
July 29, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Skull Shaver, LLC. (JL)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/29/20. 7/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Freedom Grooming ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14454704.), filed by Skull Shaver, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Case Management Track Form, #5 Designation Form, #6 Declaration)(SOLIMAN, AHMED)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skull Shaver, LLC v. Freedom Grooming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skull Shaver, LLC
Represented By: AHMED M. SOLIMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Grooming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?