ROSS (DENUCCI) et al v. PFIZER, INC. et al
Plaintiff: HAROLD HOFFMAN and PATTI ROSS (DENUCCI)
Defendant: WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC, PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC and WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2020cv03996
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF 10/13/20 THAT THE APPLICATION OF JEFFREY H. HOROWITZ, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH ON 10/13/20. 10/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF 10/13/20 THAT THE APPLICATION OF SHARON D. MAYO, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH ON 10/13/20. 10/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF 10/13/20 THAT THE APPLICATION OF DANIEL MEYERS, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH ON 10/13/20. 10/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Daniel Meyers ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14630702.) filed by PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC.Certificate of Service.(BOISVERT, CHRISTOPHER)
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sharon D. Mayo ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14630696.) filed by PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC.Certificate of Service.(BOISVERT, CHRISTOPHER)
October 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeffrey H. Horowitz ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14630684.) filed by PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC.Certificate of Service.(BOISVERT, CHRISTOPHER)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 10/9/20 THAT THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORTOF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT CURRENTLY DUE ON OCTOBER 20, 2020 IS CONTINUED TO NOVEMBER 3, 2020.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 10/9/20. 10/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendants' Time to Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by HAROLD HOFFMAN, PATTI ROSS (DENUCCI).Certificate of Service.(KASSAN, RANDI)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES STIPULATION, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER, THE DEADLINE TO FILE PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT CURRENTLY DUE ON OCTOBER 13, 2020 IS CONTINUED TO OCTOBER 20, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 10/8/20. 10/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants Motion to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement filed by HAROLD HOFFMAN, PATTI ROSS (DENUCCI).Certificate of Service.(KASSAN, RANDI) Modified on 10/9/2020 (fb).
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JUDY LEE LEONE on behalf of PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC with Certificate of Service(LEONE, JUDY)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Pfizer Inc. with Certificate of Service by PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC.(BOISVERT, CHRISTOPHER)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or, MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC.Memorandum of Law; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(BOISVERT, CHRISTOPHER)
September 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA LLC and WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC. E-mailed to counsel on 9/8/20 (mbh, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PFIZER, INC., Pharmacia LLC f/k/a Pharmacia Corporation, Parke, Davis & Company LLC as successor-in-interest of Parke, Davis & Company, Warner-Lambert Company LLC f/k/a Warner-Lambert Company, filed by PATTI ROSS (DENUCCI), HAROLD HOFFMAN. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Pharmacia LLC, #2 Summons - Warner Lambert Company LLC, #3 Summons - Parke, Davis & Company LLC)(KASSAN, RANDI)
August 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/17/2020 (bw, )
August 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HAROLD HOFFMAN, PATTI ROSS (DENUCCI). (fb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14498937.), filed by PATTI ROSS (DENUCCI), HAROLD HOFFMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Pfizer, #3 Summons - Park, Davis & Co., #4 Summons - Pharmacia Corporation, #5 Summons - Warner Lambert Co., #6 Summons - Warner Lambert Company LLC)(KASSAN, RANDI) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2020: #7 Designation Form, #8 Case Management Track Form) (fb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSS (DENUCCI) et al v. PFIZER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. BOISVERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. BOISVERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. BOISVERT
Represented By: DANIEL M. MEYERS
Represented By: SHARON D. MAYO
Represented By: JEFFREY H. HOROWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMACIA CORPORATION
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. BOISVERT
Represented By: DANIEL M. MEYERS
Represented By: SHARON D. MAYO
Represented By: JEFFREY H. HOROWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKE, DAVIS & CO.
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. BOISVERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMACIA LLC
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. BOISVERT
Represented By: DANIEL M. MEYERS
Represented By: SHARON D. MAYO
Represented By: JEFFREY H. HOROWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. BOISVERT
Represented By: DANIEL M. MEYERS
Represented By: SHARON D. MAYO
Represented By: JEFFREY H. HOROWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. BOISVERT
Represented By: DANIEL M. MEYERS
Represented By: SHARON D. MAYO
Represented By: JEFFREY H. HOROWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. BOISVERT
Represented By: DANIEL M. MEYERS
Represented By: SHARON D. MAYO
Represented By: JEFFREY H. HOROWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD HOFFMAN
Represented By: RANDI KASSAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATTI ROSS (DENUCCI)
Represented By: RANDI KASSAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?