COLON v. BUDGET/AVIS RENTAL CAR LLC
Plaintiff: ROLANDO JAVIER COLON
Defendant: BUDGET/AVIS RENTAL CAR LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv04078
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #9 TO PLAINTIFF. (jaa, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 Letter dated 10/2/20 by ROLANDO JAVIER COLON to Judge Beetlestone. (er, )
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (DOC. NO. #8 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/8/20.10/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 ROLANDO JAVIER COLON MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL..(JL )
September 24, 2020 MAILED DOC #4 TO PRO SE R. COLON AT SCI DALLAS (JL )
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 Copy of Order/Notice dated 8/26/20 (Document # 4) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to ROLANDO JAVIER COLON for the following reason: NOT IN NORTHAMPTION JAIL. (JL )
September 14, 2020 DOCS. 5 AND 6 MAILED TO PRO SE AND FAXED TO WARDEN. (sg, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. ROLANDO JAVIER COLON SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 IN INSTALLMENTS REGARDLESS OF THE OUTCOME OF THE CASE. THE COURT DIRECTS THE WARDEN OF NORTHAMPTON COUNTY PRISON TO ASSESS AN INITIAL FILING FEE OF 20% AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF NORTHAMPTON COUNTY PRISON. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/14/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE OR WARDEN. (amas, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/14/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (JL )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by ROLANDO JAVIER COLON. (bw, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BUDGET/AVIS RENTAL CAR LLC, filed by ROLANDO JAVIER COLON. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ROLANDO JAVIER COLON..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLON v. BUDGET/AVIS RENTAL CAR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLANDO JAVIER COLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUDGET/AVIS RENTAL CAR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?