GONZALEZ v. RUSSELL et al
Plaintiff: CARLOS GONZALEZ
Defendant: SGT. KAWAL, DOUG HANES, BRIANNA HENRY, KYLE RUSSELL, JOSEPH OSCELLUS, LIEUTENANT DALY and LEHIGH COUNTY PRISON
Case Number: 5:2020cv04531
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 18 CARLOS GONZALEZ MOTION FOR INDIVIDUALLY PARAGRAPHED QUESTIONS FOR THE DEFENDANTS TO SHED LIGHT/REASON FOR THE CLAIM IN QUESTION..(JL)
November 9, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT by CARLOS GONZALEZ. (fdc, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO REQUEST TO HAVE COUNSEL APPOINTED filed by CARLOS GONZALEZ..(jaa, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO ADD THIS EXTENDED AND DISCRIPTIVE VERSION TO THE ALREADY EXISITING COPLAINT ON FILE filed by CARLOS GONZALEZ..(jaa, )
October 21, 2020 PLEADING #13 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL )
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 10/20/20. 10/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO GONZALEZ.(rf, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 Letter by CARLOS GONZALEZ *ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, )
October 19, 2020 Mailed Doc. 6 to Pro Se Plaintiff. (er, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CARLOS GONZALEZ..(sg, )
October 14, 2020 COPY OF #11 TO PRO SE AND WARDEN OF LEHIGH COUNTY (JL )
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THEWARDEN OF LEHIGH COUNTY PRISON. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED NOT TO ISSUE SUMMONS[ES] AT THIS TIME. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 10/13/2020. 10/13/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE OR WARDEN.(sg, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 Letter dated 9/30/20 by CARLOS GONZALEZ (jpd, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CARLOS GONZALEZ..(sg, )
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT IN LIGHT OF GONZALEZ'S REPRESENTATION THAT HE IS EXPERIENCING DIFFICULTY OBTAINING A COPY OF HIS ACCOUNT STATEMENT, HE MAY PRESENT THIS ORDER TO AN APPROPRIATE PRISON OFFICIAL WHO SHALL PROMPTLY SUPPLY HIM WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT FOR THE TIME PERIOD FROM MARCH 14, 2020 TO SEPTEMBER 14, 2020. IF GONZALEZ CANNOT OBTAIN THE NECESSARY RECORDS BUT STILL SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE SHOULD FILE AN AFFIDAVIT WITH THE COURT ATTESTING TO THE SPECIFIC STEPS HE TOOK TO OBTAIN THE ACCOUNT STATEMENT AS REQUIRED BY 28 USC 1915(a)(2). SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 10/1/20. 10/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO GONZALEZ.(rf, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 Letter dated 9/25/20 by CARLOS GONZALEZ (fdc, )
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ADD LEHIGH COUNTY PRISON AS A DEFENDANT IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/28/20. 9/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO GONZALEZ.(rf, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to the Clerk of Court from CARLOS GONZALEZ *ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, )
September 22, 2020 Document #4 mailed to pro se plff. (kw, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IF GONZALEZ SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS HE SHALL WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. ALTERNATIVELY, GONZALEZ CAN PROCEED BY SUBMITTING $400 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/21/20. 9/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO GONZALEZ.(rf, )
September 17, 2020 DOC # 3 (PRO SE GUIDELINES) MAILED TO GONZALEZ ON 9/17/20 (rf, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against DALY, DOUG HANES, BRIANNA HENRY, KAWAL, JOSEPH OSCELLUS, KYLE RUSSELL, filed by CARLOS GONZALEZ. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CARLOS GONZALEZ..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GONZALEZ v. RUSSELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. KAWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUG HANES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIANNA HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE RUSSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH OSCELLUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT DALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEHIGH COUNTY PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?