Leiby et al v. THE PEPSI BOTTLING GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Leiby and Marie Leiby
Defendant: THE PEPSI BOTTLING GROUP, INC., DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION and DOLGENCORP, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv04898
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DOLGENCORP, LLC, filed by Marie Leiby.(ALTEMOSE, MARK)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF 11/25/20 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERD THAT THE PLAINTIFS ARE GRANTED LEAVE OF TWENTY (20) DAYS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE FORM ATTACHED TO THE STIPULATION AS EXHIBIT A. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 11/25/20. 11/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint, Add Party and Change Name by Marie Leiby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ALTEMOSE, MARK)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE PEPSI BOTTLING GROUP, INC.. THE PEPSI BOTTLING GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (ALTEMOSE, MARK)
November 11, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION. DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (ALTEMOSE, MARK)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RANDY C. GREENE on behalf of THE PEPSI BOTTLING GROUP, INC. with certificate of service(GREENE, RANDY)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against THE PEPSI BOTTLING GROUP, INC. by DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HANNON, SEAN)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN P. HANNON on behalf of DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(HANNON, SEAN)
October 5, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marie Leiby, Richard Leiby. (JL )
October 5, 2020 Summons Issued as to DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION, THE PEPSI BOTTLING GROUP, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/5/2020 (bw, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14613108.), filed by Marie Leiby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form Designation Form)(ALTEMOSE, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leiby et al v. THE PEPSI BOTTLING GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Leiby
Represented By: MARK K. ALTEMOSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Leiby
Represented By: MARK K. ALTEMOSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PEPSI BOTTLING GROUP, INC.
Represented By: RANDY C. GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION
Represented By: SEAN P. HANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOLGENCORP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?