LUCKETT v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: JAMES LUCKETT
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION doing business as CONRAIL SHARED ASSETS
Case Number: 5:2020cv04975
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES LUCKETT re: Richard Kreitzer served Summons and Complaint upon CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION by Personal. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (MYERS, ROBERT)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT IT IS HEREBY AGREED AMONG COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, ROBERT E. MYERS, ESQUIRE AND COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, RICHARD K. HOHN, ESQUIRE THAT DEFENDANT, CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION D/B/A CONRAIL SHARED ASSETS, MAY EXTEND THE TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY THIRTY (30) DAYS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/18/20. 11/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint together with Additional Defenses by CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION.(SIRBAK, JOSEPH)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney) extend time to file response by CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION. (HOHN, RICHARD)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN DOUGHERTY on behalf of CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION (DOUGHERTY, STEPHEN)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD K. HOHN on behalf of CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION (HOHN, RICHARD)
October 9, 2020 Summons Issued as to CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/9/2020 (bw, )
October 8, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JAMES LUCKETT. (tjd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14623567.), filed by JAMES LUCKETT.(MYERS, ROBERT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2020: #1 Signed Designation Form) (tjd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUCKETT v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION doing business as CONRAIL SHARED ASSETS
Represented By: RICHARD K. HOHN
Represented By: JOSEPH P. SIRBAK, II
Represented By: STEPHEN DOUGHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LUCKETT
Represented By: ROBERT E. MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?