GERARD v. CONLEY
Plaintiff: JAMES GERARD
Defendant: LORI J CONLEY
Case Number: 5:2020cv05042
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint together with WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by LORI J CONLEY.(VOCI, GREGORY)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO BE CONDUCTED VIA TELEPHONE Please be advised that an initial pretrial conference to be conducted via telephone before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned case has been scheduled for MONDAY, JANUARY 4, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. Counsel for all the parties will use dial in number 1-571-353-2300 and use pin 363 973 916# to enter the conference call.(sres, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY P VOCI on behalf of LORI J CONLEY (VOCI, GREGORY)
October 15, 2020 Summons Issued as to LORI J CONLEY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/15/2020 (bw, )
October 12, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JAMES GERARD. (md, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LORI J CONLEY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14630750.), filed by JAMES GERARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(COMITZ, JONATHAN) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/15/2020) (md, ). Modified on 10/15/2020 (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GERARD v. CONLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI J CONLEY
Represented By: GREGORY P VOCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GERARD
Represented By: JONATHAN S. COMITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?