KETNER et al v. WIDELL et al
Plaintiff: FORGEDALE TRADING, LLC and JOHN M KETNER
Defendant: GREGORY S WIDELL, ROBINSON DELAWARE HOLDINGS, INC. D/B/A ROBINSON TECHNICAL PRODUCTS CORPORATION, INWELD CORPORATION and ROBINSON TECHNICAL PRODUCTS, INC.
Nominal Defendant: COPLAY NORSTAR, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv06360
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN M KETNER. INWELD CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; ROBINSON DELAWARE HOLDINGS, INC. D/B/A ROBINSON TECHNICAL PRODUCTS CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; ROBINSON TECHNICAL PRODUCTS, INC. waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; GREGORY S WIDELL waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021. (SCHWARTZ, NOAH)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 12/21/20. 12/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
December 18, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FORGEDALE TRADING, LLC, JOHN M KETNER. (JL)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against COPLAY NORSTAR, LLC, INWELD CORPORATION, ROBINSON DELAWARE HOLDINGS, INC. D/B/A ROBINSON TECHNICAL PRODUCTS CORPORATION, ROBINSON TECHNICAL PRODUCTS, INC., GREGORY S WIDELL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14791926.), filed by JOHN M KETNER, FORGEDALE TRADING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHWARTZ, NOAH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2020: #2 Designation Form) (lvj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KETNER et al v. WIDELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY S WIDELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINSON DELAWARE HOLDINGS, INC. D/B/A ROBINSON TECHNICAL PRODUCTS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INWELD CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINSON TECHNICAL PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORGEDALE TRADING, LLC
Represented By: NOAH A. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN M KETNER
Represented By: NOAH A. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: COPLAY NORSTAR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?