MIRARCHI v. BOOCKVAR et al
Plaintiff: ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI
Defendant: MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KATHY BOOCKVAR, KAMALA D. HARRIS, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, SEC-BOARD, FBI-PA & WASHINGTON DC, ERIE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, USDOJ-PA, BUCKS COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DAUPHIN COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, PHILADELPHIA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, LEHIGH COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, LACKAWANNA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, HOUSE FINANCIAL SERVICES COMMITTEE and DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Case Number: 5:2021cv00126
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, BUCKS COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DAUPHIN COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, ERIE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, FBI-PA & WASHINGTON DC, KAMALA D. HARRIS, HOUSE FINANCIAL SERVICES COMMITTEE, LACKAWANNA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, LEHIGH COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, PHILADELPHIA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, SEC-BOARD, USDOJ-PA. Forwarded To: Ercole A. Mirarchi on 3/8/21 (dt, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF 3/8/21 THAT IT APPEARING THAT PLAINTIFF FILED THE FINAL AMENDED COMPLAINT AS DIRECTED BY ORDER OF THIS COURT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 3/8/21. 3/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Letter dated 3/8/21 by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI (Attachments: #1 EMAIL ATTACHMENT)(JL )
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Final Amended Complaint, per 2/12/2021 Court Order against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL COMBINE ALL RELEVANT ALLEGATIONS INTO ONE FINAL AMENDED COMPLAINT. SAID COMPLAINT SHALL CONTROL IN THIS MATTER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF COURT AND WILL BE THE ONLY DOCUMENT REFERENCED BY THE COURT OR THE PARTIES; PLAINTIFFS FINAL AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; AND NO ADDITIONAL FILINGS SHALL BE PERMITTED OTHER THAN OR AFTER THE FINAL AMENDED COMPLAINT IS FILED. UPON FILING OF PLAINTIFFS FINAL AMENDED COMPLAINT, NO FURTHER AMENDMENTS WILL BE PERMITTED. AT SUCH TIME, AFTER SERVICE IS COMPLETED, DEFENDANTS MAY FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 2/12/21. 2/12/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TWENTY-FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL ATTACHMENT)(JL )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Twentieth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Nineteenth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Eighteenth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Seventeenth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Sixteenth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $402, receipt number PPE223739 (mbh, )
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Fifteenth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, ).
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Fourteenth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Thirteenth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Twelfth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Eleventh Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Tenth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Ninth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Eighth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Seventh Amended Complaint filed by ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Sixth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI.(mbh, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Fifth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Document#5 and IFP application mailed to ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI (dt, )
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Fourth Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Third Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF 1/19/21 THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING SUBMITTED A COMPLAINT TO THE COURST WITHOUT EITHER PAY THE FEES OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IFP; IT IS ORDERED THAT IF PLAINTFF SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST PAY THE FILING FEE OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK SHALL PROVIDE PLAINTIFF WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER IFP APPLICATION BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. ETC. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/19/21. 1/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. (DT)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Second Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 First Amended Complaint against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS and NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (Attachments: #1 E-mail attachment)(mbh, )
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, filed by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT 2, #2 COMPLAINT 3, #3 Designation Form)(bw, )
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI. (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIRARCHI v. BOOCKVAR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH R. BIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY BOOCKVAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAMALA D. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHAMPTON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEC-BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI-PA & WASHINGTON DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USDOJ-PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKS COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAUPHIN COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEHIGH COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LACKAWANNA COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSE FINANCIAL SERVICES COMMITTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERCOLE A. MIRARCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?