PODGUSKI v. SAUL
Plaintiff: JONATHAN M. PODGUSKI
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 5:2021cv02752
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: RICHARD A LLORET
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 Social Security Magistrate Consent by JONATHAN M. PODGUSKI.. (FROELICH, JAMES)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE CONSENT FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. FAILURE TO COMPLETE AND FILE THE FORM AS ORDERED HEREIN SHALL BE DEEMED CONSENT TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRTE JUDGE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 08/03/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) 08/04/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED AND THE CLERK SHALL SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY ELECTRONIC MEANS, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 6/24/21. 6/24/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
June 24, 2021 Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (va, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Procedural Order 6/23/21 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (Attachments: #1 SS PROCEDURAL ORDER)(bw, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/12/2021) (nd, ).
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(bw, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by JONATHAN M. PODGUSKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LETTER)(bw, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JONATHAN M. PODGUSKI..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PODGUSKI v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN M. PODGUSKI
Represented By: JAMES CHRISTOPHER FROELICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?