ALLENTOWN VICTORY CHURCH v. CITY OF ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA et al
Plaintiff: ALLENTOWN VICTORY CHURCH
Defendant: CITY OF ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA, ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE CITY OF ALLENTOWN and ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE CITY OF ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 5:2021cv03021
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT THE CITY OF ALLENTOWN'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WILL NOW BE DUE ON SEPTEMBER 20, 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 8/18/21. 8/18/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED. (er, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension by CITY OF ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA. (AMBROSE, TRICIA)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Supreme Allah re: served affadavit of service City of Allentown Zoning Hearing Board upon Fred Andrayko by Personal on 8/16/2021 (POLIN, STEVEN)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by TRICIA M. AMBROSE on behalf of CITY OF ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(AMBROSE, TRICIA)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. MACMAIN on behalf of CITY OF ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(MACMAIN, DAVID)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Supreme Allah re: served Summons and Complaint City of Allentown Zoning Hearing Board upon Elizabeth, Solicitor's Office by Personal on 08/04/2021 (POLIN, STEVEN)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Supreme Allah re: served Summons and Complaint City of Allentown upon Elizabeth, Solicitor's Office by personal on 08/04/2021 (POLIN, STEVEN)
July 26, 2021 Mailed Doc. 3 to Unreps. (er, )
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF STEVEN G. POLIN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 7/12/21.7/12/21 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO UNREP) E-MAILED.(er, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Steven G. Polin ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15244394.) filed by ALLENTOWN VICTORY CHURCH.Certificate of Service.(NEWMAN, NANCY)
July 8, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLENTOWN VICTORY CHURCH. (JL )
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ALLENTOWN VICTORY CHURCH against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15240706.), filed by ALLENTOWN VICTORY CHURCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(NEWMAN, NANCY)
July 8, 2021 Summons Issued as to CITY OF ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA, ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE CITY OF ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/8/21 (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLENTOWN VICTORY CHURCH v. CITY OF ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLENTOWN VICTORY CHURCH
Represented By: STEVEN G POLIN
Represented By: NANCY MARCUS NEWMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: DAVID J. MACMAIN
Represented By: TRICIA M. AMBROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE CITY OF ALLENTOWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE CITY OF ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?