KRIES et al v. PALMER TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: AUGUST B. KREIS, IV and AUGUST BYRON KREIS, IV
Defendant: PALMER TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, MAGISTERIAL DISTRICT NUMBER, EVAN GOLDSTIEN and PATRICK A CLINESE
Case Number: 5:2021cv03321
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PATRICK A CLINESE, EVAN GOLDSTIEN, MAGISTERIAL DISTRICT NUMBER 03-2-09, PALMER TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, filed by AUGUST B. KREIS, IV, AUGUST BYRON KREIS, IV., EXHIBITS, ENEVLOPE ATTACHED(rf, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PATRICK A CLINESE, EVAN GOLDSTIEN, MAGISTERIAL DISTRICT NUMBER 03-2-09, PALMER TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT filed by AUGUST B. KREIS, IV.(jaa, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PATRICK A CLINESE, EVAN GOLDSTIEN, MAGISTERIAL DISTRICT NUMBER 03-2-09, PALMER TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, filed by AUGUST B. KREIS, IV., ENVELOPE ATTACHED(rf, )
July 29, 2021 DOC. 3 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (rf, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against PATRICK A CLINESE, EVAN GOLDSTIEN, MAGISTERIAL DISTRICT NUMBER 03-2-09, PALMER TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, filed by AUGUST B KREIS, IV, AUGUST BYRON KREIS, IV., EXHIBITS, *IFP PENDING* *ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rf, ) Modified on 7/28/2021 (rf, ). Modified on 7/28/2021 (md, ).
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by AUGUST BYRON KREIS, IV, AUGUST B KRIES, IV..(rf, ) Modified on 7/28/2021 (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRIES et al v. PALMER TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUGUST B. KREIS, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUGUST BYRON KREIS, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALMER TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGISTERIAL DISTRICT NUMBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVAN GOLDSTIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK A CLINESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?