HANNA v. BERKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE COLIN BOYER et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN W. HANNA
Defendant: BERKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE COLIN BOYER, PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE SEAN FITZGERALD, READING POLICE DEPARTMENT SGT. MENGES, KYLE "DOE" and MAGISTRATE "JANE DOE"
Case Number: 5:2021cv03812
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN CONLEY on behalf of READING POLICE DEPARTMENT SGT. MENGES with Certificate of Service(CONLEY, BRIAN)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. MACMAIN on behalf of READING POLICE DEPARTMENT SGT. MENGES with certificate of service(MACMAIN, DAVID)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by KEVIN W. HANNA. (JL)
September 1, 2021 PAPER #4 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL )
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. IF HANNA SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE SHALL, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, AND A CURRENT BALANCE, FROM ANY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY IN WHICH HE WAS CONFINED DURING THE TIME PERIOD FROM FEBRUARY 23, 2021 THROUGH AUGUST 23, 2021. ALTERNATIVELY, HANNA CAN PROCEED BY SUBMITTING $402 (COMPRISING THE $350 FILING FEE AND $52 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/30/21. 8/31/21 ENTERED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va, )
August 27, 2021 PRO SE GUIDELINES MAILED TO HANNA (rf, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BERKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE COLIN BOYER, KYLE "DOE", MAGISTRATE "JANE DOE", PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE SEAN FITZGERALD, READING POLICE DEPARTMENT SGT. MENGES, filed by KEVIN W. HANNA.(bw, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by KEVIN W. HANNA..(bw, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/26/2021) (bw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HANNA v. BERKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE COLIN BOYER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN W. HANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE COLIN BOYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE SEAN FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: READING POLICE DEPARTMENT SGT. MENGES
Represented By: DAVID J. MACMAIN
Represented By: BRIAN CONLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE "DOE"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGISTRATE "JANE DOE"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?