FELKER v. NATIONAL CART CO. EAST, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SETH FELKER
Defendant: NATIONAL CART CO. EAST, LLC, NATIONAL CART, LLC, NATIONAL CART CO., WINHOLT EQUIPMENT GROUP and WIN-HOLT EQUIPMENT CORP.
Case Number: 5:2021cv03996
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE MOTION (ECF NO. #12 ) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS IS EXTENDED. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL SIXTY (60) DAYS TO EFFECT PROPER SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BROCKINGTON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 11/4/21. 11/5/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 11/4/21 THAT THE PLAINTIFF WILL WITHDRAW HIS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 55. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 11/4/21. 11/4/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT WINHOLT EQUIPMENT GROUP AND WIN-HOLT EQUIPMENT CORP WILL HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE ENTRY OF THIS STIPULATIONTO FILE THEIR ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 11/4/21. 11/4/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
November 1, 2021 Filing 19 Disclosure with Certification of Service by NATIONAL CART CO..(DAULERIO, HUGH)
October 29, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY J. NOYE on behalf of WIN-HOLT EQUIPMENT CORP., WINHOLT EQUIPMENT GROUP (NOYE, HENRY)
October 27, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SETH FELKER (LESSIN, JEFFREY)
October 27, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SETH FELKER (LESSIN, JEFFREY)
October 26, 2021 Default Entered (mbh, )
October 26, 2021 DEFAULT BY WIN-HOLT EQUIPMENT CORP. AND WINHOLT EQUIPMENT GROUP FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (mbh, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Default Winholt Equipment Group and Winholt Equipment Corp. SETH FELKER against WIN-HOLT EQUIPMENT CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LESSIN, JEFFREY)
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JANUARY 4, 2022 AT 1:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE VIA TELECONFERENCE.(dc)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF 10/21/21 THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) SHALL BE HELD ON DECEMBER 9, 2021 AT 11:30AM. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/21/21. 10/21/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (DT)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF 10/21/21 THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE RICE FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/21/21. 10/21/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES . (DT) Modified on 10/21/2021 (dt, ).
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment filed by SETH FELKER.Brief, Affidavit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(LESSIN, JEFFREY) Modified on 10/22/2021 (md, ).
October 20, 2021 Filing 10 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against SETH FELKER by NATIONAL CART CO.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DAULERIO, HUGH)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF 10/14/21 THAT UPON REVIEW OF THE PARTIES' STIPULATION FILED ON 10/13/21, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAITNFF'S COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 10/20/21. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/14/21. 10/14/21 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (DT) Modified on 10/14/2021 (dt, ).
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint by NATIONAL CART CO.. (DAULERIO, HUGH)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by HUGH DAULERIO on behalf of NATIONAL CART CO., NATIONAL CART, LLC, NATIONAL CART CO. EAST, LLC with Certification of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DAULERIO, HUGH) Modified on 9/17/2021 (lisad, ).
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY R. LESSIN on behalf of SETH FELKER with Certificate of Service(LESSIN, JEFFREY)
September 14, 2021 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought.(SEE PAPER #5 FOR PDF) (md, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT Certification pursuant to local rule 53.2 Section 3(c)(2) by SETH FELKER. (LESSIN, JEFFREY)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADLEPHIA County. (ke, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 Praecipe to Attach Exhibit by NATIONAL CART CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BILLET, ROBERT)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, )
September 8, 2021 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file CIVIL COVER SHEET AND DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONAL CART CO. EAST, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15387611), filed by NATIONAL CART CO. EAST, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhbit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(BILLET, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FELKER v. NATIONAL CART CO. EAST, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SETH FELKER
Represented By: JEFFREY R. LESSIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CART CO. EAST, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT DOUGLAS BILLET
Represented By: HUGH DAULERIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CART, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT DOUGLAS BILLET
Represented By: HUGH DAULERIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CART CO.
Represented By: ROBERT DOUGLAS BILLET
Represented By: HUGH DAULERIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINHOLT EQUIPMENT GROUP
Represented By: HENRY J. NOYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIN-HOLT EQUIPMENT CORP.
Represented By: HENRY J. NOYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?