CLARK v. ALBERT et al
Plaintiff: SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR.
Defendant: LT. BROOKE ALBERT, WARDEN, KYLE RUSSELL and DIRECTOR JANINE DONATE
Case Number: 5:2021cv04096
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR. (envelope attached). (er, )
October 27, 2021 PLEADING #8 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED AS MOOT; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/26/21.10/26/21 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(JL )
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT - (ENVELOPE ATTACHED). (er, )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT MR. CLARK'S PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR. #0205753 SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 IN INSTALLMENT REGARDLESS OF THE OUTCOME OF THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF LEHIGH COUNTY JAIL. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND MR. CLARK A BLANK COPY OF THE COURT'S FORM COMPLAINT FOR A PRISONER FILING A CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. IF MR. CLARK DOES NOT WISH TO AMEND HIS COMPLAINT AND INSTEAD INTENDS TO STAND ON HIS COMPLAINT AS ORIGINALLY PLED, HE MAY FILED A NOTICE WITH THE COURT ON OR BEFORE 11/19/21. IF MR. CLARK FAILS TO FILE ANY RESPONSE TO THIS ORDER, THE COURT WILL CONCLUDE THAT MR. CLARK STANDS ON HIS COMPLAINT AND WILL ISSUE A FINAL ORDER DISMISSING THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/20/21. 10/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (COPY EMAILED TO WARDEN OF LEHIGH COUNTY JAIL)(mbh, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/20/21. 10/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, ) (COPY EMAILED TO WARDEN OF LEHIGH COUNTY JAIL)
October 20, 2021 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRIES #5 #6 WITH COMPLAINT FORM TO PLAINTIFF ON 10/20/21. (jaa, )
September 16, 2021 DOC. 4 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR. (bw, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BROOKE ALBERT, JANINE DONATE, KYLE RUSSELL, filed by SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR.(bw, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARK v. ALBERT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. BROOKE ALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN, KYLE RUSSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTOR JANINE DONATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?