MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY v. WERLEY et al
Plaintiff: MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: CHAD WERLEY and JANE WERLEY
Case Number: 5:2021cv05592
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 Document #5 Mailed to Unrep Parties Chad Werley and Jane Werley. (DT) Modified on 2/10/2022 (dt).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD AN ON-THE-RECORD TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON WEDNESDAY, MARCH 2, 2022, AT 2:30 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 2/9/22. 2/9/22 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO UNREPS) AND E-MAILED.(er)
January 13, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY. CHAD WERLEY waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022; JANE WERLEY waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Edgar, Candace)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY.(Edgar, Candace)
December 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to CHAD WERLEY, JANE WERLEY. Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/23/21 (mas, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Complaint (Attorney), (Edgar, Candace)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15626973.), filed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(Edgar, Candace) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/23/2021) (sbt, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/23/2021) (sbt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY v. WERLEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Candace N Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WERLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE WERLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?