WILLIAMS v. TICE et al
Petitioner: ANTHONY WILLIAMS
Respondent: WARDEN TICE, PA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF LEHIGH and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PA
Case Number: 5:2022cv00245
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: RICHARD A LLORET
Referring Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT PETITIONER ANTHONY WILLIAMS' #12 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST THE LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY IS DENIED. THE DOCKET REFLECTS THAT THE COMMONWEALTH WAS GRANTED AN ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO MR. WILLIAMS' PETITION, AND THE RESPONSE WILL BE DUE ON 4/9/22 #11 . SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 3/16/22.3/16/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED. MAILED TO WILLIAMS. (fdc)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment against LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY filed by ANTHONY WILLIAMS.CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE.(ENVELOPE ATTACHED)(dt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2022: #1 envelope) (dt).
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Order (#11) mailed to Williams. (fdc)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE COMMONWEALTH'S #10 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER IS GRANTED. THE LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SHALL FILE ITS LIMITED RESPONSE ON OR BEFORE 4/9/22. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 3/8/22.3/8/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO WILLIAMS. (fdc)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Order for Prisoner State Record,,,, filed by THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF LEHIGH.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to RICHARD A. LLORET.(GALLAGHER, HEATHER)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter dated 2/19/22 by ANTHONY WILLIAMS (fdc)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter dated 2/15/22 Re: Status Update (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(sbt)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter dated 1/26/22 by ANTHONY WILLIAMS (sbt)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER F. GALLAGHER on behalf of THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF LEHIGH with Certificate of Service(GALLAGHER, HEATHER)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SHALL ENTER THEIR APPERANCE ON BEHALF OF THE RESPONDENTS UPON RECEIPT OF THIS ORDER. THE LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SHALL FILE A LIMITED RESPONSE ON OR BEFORE 3/10/22, ADVISING THE COURT (1) WHETHER THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OR THE PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL WISH TO FILE A SUBSTANTIVE RESPONSE TO THE CLAIM RAISED IN THE PETITION; AND (2) THE STATUS OF ANY OPEN CASES OR ADMINISTRATIVE ACTIONS PENDING AGAINST PETITIONER. THE LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SHALL CONTACT THE PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE REGARDING THIS ACTION AND SHALL PROVIDE THE BOARD WITH ALL NECESSARY DOCUMENTATION FOR THE BOARD TO MAKE A DETERMINATION REGARDING ITS RESPONSE TO THE PETITION. AS REQUIRED BY 18 USC SEC. 3771(B)(2), THE COMMONWEALTH SHALL ENSURE THAT IN A FEDERAL HABEAS CORPUS PROCEEDING ARISING OUT OF A STATE CONVICTION, ANY CRIME VICTIMS ARE AFFORDED THEIR RIGHTS UNDER THE CRIME VICTIMS ACT, AS AMENDED JULY 27, 2006. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 2/10/22. 2/11/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO WILLIAMS.(fdc)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Mailed doc. 5 to Pro SE. (er)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Petition #1 , Order #5 , and Docket Report E-mailed to Lehigh County District Attorney's Office, PA Attorney General's Office. (fdc)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Petition #1 and Order #4 E-mailed to Lehigh County District Attorney's Office. (fdc)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Order #4 mailed to Williams. (fdc)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 2/8/22. 2/8/22 ENTERED. NOT MAILED TO WILLIAMS. COPY OF ORDER E-MAILED TO PA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL. (fdc)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing Fee for HABEAS CORPUS by ANTHONY WILLIAMS. (Filing Fee $5, PPE236779 (Filing fee $ 5.) (jaa, )
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #3 WITH IFP APPLICATION TO PETITIONER 1/25/22. (jaa, )
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH WILLIAMS WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT IFP APPLICATION (SHORT FORM) BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 1/24/22. 1/24/22 ENTERED. NOT MAILED TO WILLIAMS. (fdc)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. MAILED TO WILLIAMS. (fdc)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ANTHONY WILLIAMS. (FILING FEE NOT PAID; IFP NOT FILED)(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. TICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTHONY WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN TICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF LEHIGH
Represented By: HEATHER F. GALLAGHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?